Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Erwin Kršutler, C.Pp.S.

Prelate Emeritus of Xingu, Para, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1939 Born
3 Jul 196525.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Precious Blood
7 Nov 198041.3AppointedCoadjutor Prelate of Xingu, Para, Brazil
25 Jan 198141.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Prelate of Xingu, Para, Brazil
2 Sep 198142.1SucceededPrelate of Xingu, Para, Brazil
23 Dec 201576.4RetiredPrelate of Xingu, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Erwin Kršutler
Bishop Erwin Kršutler C.Pp.S. (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Xingu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKoblach, Austria
Ordained BishopAltamira

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Xingu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Dec 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 66, Number 5,187
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast