Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Jean Marie Kervennic

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1922Born
18 Mar 194522.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
29 Jun 194523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
2 Oct 197654.3AppointedBishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France
28 Nov 197654.4Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France
21 Dec 199169.5DiedBishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier), France

MicroData Summary for Pierre Jean Marie Kervennic
Bishop Pierre Jean Marie Kervennic (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Pierre-Quilbignou, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Ordained DeaconMajor Seminary, Chapel, Quimper, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Ordained PriestSaint-Corentin, Cathedral, Quimper, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Ordained BishopSaint-Étienne, Cathedral, Saint-Brieuc, Diocese of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier)
Death PlaceSaint-Brieuc, Diocese of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier)
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Étienne, Cathedral, Saint-Brieuc, Diocese of Saint-Brieuc (-Tréguier)

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 38, Number 2,391
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 11 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast