Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Kamau Ng’ang’a

Auxiliary Bishop of Nairobi, Kenya

Titular Bishop of Oëa

Apostolic Administrator of Nairobi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1955 Born
10 Jan 198227.0Ordained PriestPriest of Nairobi, Kenya
22 Dec 199944.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nairobi, Kenya
22 Dec 199944.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Oëa
18 Mar 200045.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oëa
4 Jan 202166.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Nairobi, Kenya

MicroData Summary for David Kamau Ng’ang’a
Bishop David Kamau Ng’ang’a (born 1955) Auxiliary Bishop of Nairobi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKiambu
Ordained BishopNyayo National Stadium, Nairobi, Archdiocese of Nairobi

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Nairobi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,715
  • aadm: CB, 7 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Feb 2021

Quantcast