Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
26 Mar 1973 | Born | ||
21 May 2005 | 32.1 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Nairobi, Kenya |
13 Feb 2024 | 50.8 | Appointed | Auxiliary Bishop of Nairobi, Kenya |
13 Feb 2024 | 50.8 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Thucca in Mauretania |
6 Apr 2024 | 51.0 | Ordained Bishop | Titular Bishop of Thucca in Mauretania |
(WikiData: Q124520796)
Bishop
Wallace
Ng’ang’a Gachihi
(born )
Auxiliary Bishop
of Nairobi
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Gatundu, Archdiocese of Nairobi |
Ordained Bishop | Grounds of, St. Mary's School, Nairobi, Archdiocese of Nairobi |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 6 Apr 2024 |
✠