Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignatius Ayau Kaigama

Archbishop of Abuja, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1958 Born
6 Jun 198122.8Ordained PriestPriest of Jalingo, Nigeria
3 Feb 199536.5AppointedBishop of Jalingo, Nigeria
23 Apr 199536.7Ordained BishopBishop of Jalingo, Nigeria
14 Apr 200041.7AppointedArchbishop of Jos, Nigeria
11 Mar 201960.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Abuja, Nigeria
11 Mar 201960.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Jos, Nigeria
9 Nov 201961.2SucceededArchbishop of Abuja, Nigeria
31 Mar 202061.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Jos, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Ayau Kaigama (VIAF: 7148703993236930784)
Archbishop Ignatius Ayau Kaigama (born ) Archbishop of Abuja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKona
Ordained BishopJalingo, Diocese of Jalingo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Abuja.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,544
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Mar 2019
  • aadm: CB, 20 Mar 2019
  • s: Bollettino, 9 Nov 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast