Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregory Obinna Ochiagha

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Orlu, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1931Born
31 Jul 196028.9Ordained PriestPriest of Umuahia, Nigeria
29 Nov 198049.2AppointedBishop of Orlu, Nigeria
6 Jan 198149.3Ordained BishopBishop of Orlu, Nigeria
25 Mar 200876.5RetiredBishop of Orlu, Nigeria
29 Dec 202089.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Orlu, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Gregory Obinna Ochiagha
Bishop Gregory Obinna Ochiagha (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Orlu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIbeme
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceAnnunciation, Hospital, Enugu, Diocese of Enugu

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 39.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Number 5,011
  • d: CB, 29 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 29 Dec 2020

Quantcast