Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Ajang

Bishop of Lafia, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1970 Born
3 Dec 199424.6Ordained PriestPriest of Jos, Nigeria
31 Mar 202151.0AppointedBishop of Lafia, Nigeria
24 Jun 202151.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lafia, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for David Ajang
Bishop David Ajang (born ) Bishop of Lafia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZaria
Ordained BishopSt. William's, Cathedral, Lafia, Diocese of Lafia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lafia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Mar 2021
  • ob: CB, 11 May 2021
  • c2+: CB, 24 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 Jun 2021

Quantcast