Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lajos Kada

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Spain

Titular Archbishop of Thibica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1924Born
10 Oct 194823.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 197550.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thibica
20 Jun 197550.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Costa Rica
20 Jul 197550.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thibica
15 Oct 198055.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to El Salvador
8 Apr 198459.3AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Sacraments
22 Aug 199166.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
22 Sep 199570.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
6 Mar 199671.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Andorra
1 Mar 200075.2RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Spain
1 Mar 200075.2RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Andorra
26 Nov 200177.0DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Spain

MicroData Summary for Lajos Kada
Archbishop Lajos Kada (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Spain

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBudapest, Archdiocese of Esztergom, Hungary
Ordained BishopSanta Maria dell Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 30, Number 1,732
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 30 Nov 2020

Quantcast