Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Fernando García Cadiñanos

Bishop-Elect of Mondoñedo-Ferrol, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1968 Born
26 Jun 199325.1Ordained PriestPriest of Burgos, Spain
1 Jul 202153.1AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo-Ferrol, Spain
4 Sep 202153.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo-Ferrol, Spain

MicroData Summary for Fernando García Cadiñanos
Father Fernando García Cadiñanos (born ) Bishop-Elect of Mondoñedo-Ferrol

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBurgos, Archdiocese of Burgos
Ordained BishopCathedral, Mondoñedo, Diocese of Mondoñedo-Ferrol

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Mondoñedo-Ferrol.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Jul 2021
  • ob: CB, 1 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Jul 2021

Quantcast