Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Gómez Cantero

Coadjutor Bishop of Almería, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1956 Born
17 May 198124.9Ordained PriestPriest of Palencia, Spain
17 Nov 201660.4AppointedBishop of Teruel y Albarracín, Spain
21 Jan 201760.6Ordained BishopBishop of Teruel y Albarracín, Spain
8 Jan 202164.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Almería, Spain
13 Mar 202164.7InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Almería, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Gómez Cantero
Bishop Antonio Gómez Cantero (born ) Coadjutor Bishop of Almería

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuijas, Cantabria, Diocese of Santander
Ordained BishopCathedral, Teruel, Diocese of Teruel y Albarracín

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Almería.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Nov 2016
  • ob: CB, 17 Nov 2016
  • c2+: CB, 12 Jan 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,323
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Jan 2021
  • i: AM, 12 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Apr 2021

Quantcast