Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lino Esterino Garavaglia, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cesena-Sarsina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1927Born
15 Aug 194820.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
15 Aug 195123.9Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
5 Dec 195427.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
11 Feb 198658.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tivoli, Italy
8 Mar 198658.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Tivoli, Italy
6 Apr 198658.5InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Tivoli, Italy
25 Jun 198759.7SucceededBishop of Tivoli, Italy
25 Mar 199163.5AppointedBishop of Cesena-Sarsina, Italy
5 May 199163.6InstalledBishop of Cesena-Sarsina, Italy
3 Dec 200376.2RetiredBishop of Cesena-Sarsina, Italy
12 Jun 202092.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Cesena-Sarsina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lino Esterino Garavaglia
Bishop Lino Esterino Garavaglia O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cesena-Sarsina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMesero, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained PriestCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSanta Maria della Consolazione al Foro Italico, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceCasa di riposo "Don Baronio", Cesena, Diocese of Cesena-Sarsina
Buried Place (Original)Family Chapel, Cemetery, Mesero, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 65.5 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • loc: AM, 25 Jan 2020
  • d: CB, 12 Jun 2020
  • loc: AM, 1 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast