Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges-Marie-Eugène Audollent

Deceased

Bishop of Blois, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1867Born
20 Sep 189023.3Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
15 May 192557.9AppointedBishop of Blois, France
16 Jul 192558.1Ordained BishopBishop of Blois, France
9 Nov 194477.4DiedBishop of Blois, France

MicroData Summary for Georges-Marie-Eugène Audollent
Bishop Georges-Marie-Eugène Audollent (born , died ) Bishop of Blois

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1925, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast