Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Regis Fey, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kimbe, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1942Born
14 Jul 196320.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
14 Jul 196623.6Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
19 Oct 196825.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
8 Jun 201067.5AppointedBishop of Kimbe, Papua New Guinea
9 Oct 201067.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kimbe, Papua New Guinea
18 Oct 201976.9RetiredBishop of Kimbe, Papua New Guinea
19 Jan 202178.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Kimbe, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for William Regis Fey
Bishop William Regis Fey O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kimbe

EventPlace
Birth PlacePittsburgh, PA, Diocese of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Kimbe, Diocese of Kimbe
Death PlaceShadyside, Hospital, Pittsburgh, PA, Diocese of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
Buried Place (Original)Capuchin Friars' Plot, Saint Mary, Cemetery, Herman, PA

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,851
  • mn: CB, 15 Apr 2016
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Oct 2019
  • d: CB, 20 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 22 Jan 2021

Quantcast