Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-René-Adrien Brault

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Dié, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1894Born
18 Dec 192026.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Paris, France
29 Jun 192126.9Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
29 Sep 194753.2AppointedBishop of Saint-Dié, France
18 Nov 194753.3Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Dié, France
11 Jul 196469.9DiedBishop of Saint-Dié, France

MicroData Summary for Henri-René-Adrien Brault
Bishop Henri-René-Adrien Brault (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Dié

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained DeaconSt-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestSt-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceÉpinal, Diocese of Saint-Dié

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1947, Number 122
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 4, Number 131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast