Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dermot Pius Farrell

Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1954 Born
7 Jun 198025.5Ordained PriestPriest of Meath, Ireland
3 Jan 201863.1AppointedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
11 Mar 201863.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ossory, Ireland
29 Dec 202066.1AppointedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
2 Feb 202166.1InstalledArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Dermot Pius Farrell (VIAF: 282287441)
Archbishop Dermot Pius Farrell (born ) Archbishop of Dublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastletown-Geoghegan, Diocese of Meath
Ordained BishopSt. Mary's, Cathedral, Kilkenny, Diocese of Ossory

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Dublin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2018
  • ob: CB, 20 Jan 2018
  • c2+: CB, 7 Mar 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,688
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 16 Jan 2021

Quantcast