Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Smith

Bishop Emeritus of Meath, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1940 Born
9 Mar 196322.7Ordained PriestPriest of Meath, Ireland
17 Nov 198343.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Meath, Ireland
17 Nov 198343.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Leges
29 Jan 198443.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leges
13 Oct 198848.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Meath, Ireland
16 May 199049.9SucceededBishop of Meath, Ireland
18 Jun 201878.0RetiredBishop of Meath, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Michael Smith
Bishop Michael Smith (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Meath

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOldcastle
Ordained BishopChrist the King, Cathedral, Mullingar, Diocese of Meath

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Meath.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Jun 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,993

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 Mar 2021

Quantcast