Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerard Nash

Bishop of Ferns, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1959 Born
15 Jun 199132.3Ordained PriestPriest of Killaloe, Ireland
11 Jun 202162.2AppointedBishop of Ferns, Ireland
5 Sep 202162.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ferns, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Gerard Nash
Bishop Gerard Nash (born ) Bishop of Ferns

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGlandree, Diocese of Killaloe
Ordained PriestDrumcharley, Church, Tulla, Diocese of Killaloe
Ordained BishopSaint Aidan, Cathedral, Enniscorthy, Diocese of Ferns

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ferns.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2021
  • bp/c1: CB, 11 Jun 2021
  • ob: CB, 12 Jul 2021
  • c2+: CB, 2 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Sep 2021

Quantcast