Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Clemente Faccani

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Kenya

Titular Archbishop of Serra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1920Born
10 Apr 194322.4Ordained PriestPriest of Imola, Italy
27 Jun 198362.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Serra
27 Jun 198362.6AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Kenya
3 Sep 198362.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Serra
7 Feb 198564.3AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Seychelles
14 May 199473.5ResignedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Seychelles
31 Dec 199575.1RetiredApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Kenya
15 Sep 201190.9DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Kenya

MicroData Summary for Clemente Faccani
Archbishop Clemente Faccani (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Kenya

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLugo, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Francis de Salle, Church, Lugo di Romagna

  • a priest for 68.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 15 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 81, Number 6,642

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast