Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolino Giovanni Tribbioli, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Imola, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1868Born
24 Jun 189122.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
9 Apr 191344.3AppointedBishop of Imola, Italy
4 May 191344.3Ordained BishopBishop of Imola, Italy
12 May 195687.4DiedBishop of Imola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolino Giovanni Tribbioli
Bishop Paolino Giovanni Tribbioli O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Imola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMetelliano
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 43.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1913, Number 21
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,959

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Apr 2021

Quantcast