Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Linus Okok Okwach

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Homa Bay, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1952Born
10 Dec 198028.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Oct 199340.9AppointedBishop of Homa Bay, Kenya
31 Dec 199341.1Ordained BishopBishop of Homa Bay, Kenya
20 Feb 200249.3ResignedBishop of Homa Bay, Kenya
12 Sep 202067.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Homa Bay, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Linus Okok Okwach
Bishop Linus Okok Okwach (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Homa Bay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKisumu, Archdiocese of Kisumu
Ordained BishopStade, Homa Bay, Diocese of Homa Bay
Death PlaceSt. Monica's, Hospital, Kisumu, Archdiocese of Kisumu

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,296
  • d: CB, 13 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast