Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Patrick Donoghue, S.M.

Bishop of Rarotonga, Cook Islands, Pacific (Oceania)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1949 Born
7 Jan 196919.9ProfessedMember of Society of Mary
29 Jun 197526.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
11 Apr 201162.2AppointedBishop of Rarotonga, Cook Islands, Pacific (Oceania)
16 Jul 201162.4Ordained BishopBishop of Rarotonga, Cook Islands, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Paul Patrick Donoghue
Bishop Paul Patrick Donoghue S.M. (born ) Bishop of Rarotonga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAuckland, Diocese of Auckland, New Zealand
Ordained BishopSaint Joseph, Cathedral, Rarotonga, Diocese of Rarotonga, Cook Islands

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rarotonga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 10 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,115

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast