Catholic-Hierarchy DC

John Francis Cardinal Dearden

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Detroit, Michigan, USA

Cardinal-Priest of San Pio X alla Balduina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1907Born
8 Dec 193225.1Ordained PriestPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
13 Mar 194840.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
13 Mar 194840.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sarepta
18 May 194840.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sarepta
22 Dec 195043.1SucceededBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
18 Dec 195851.1AppointedArchbishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
28 Apr 196961.5Elevated to Cardinal
30 Apr 196961.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pio X alla Balduina
15 Jul 198072.7ResignedArchbishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
1 Aug 198880.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Detroit, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for John Francis Dearden (VIAF: 50842859)
John Francis Cardinal Dearden (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Detroit

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValley Falls, RI, Diocese of Providence, Rhode Island
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSaint Agnes, Church, Cleveland, Diocese of Cleveland, Ohio
Death PlaceSouthfield, Archdiocese of Detroit, Michigan
Buried Place (Original)Holy Sepulchre Catholic, Cemetery, Southfield, Archdiocese of Detroit, Michigan

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.2 years
  • a cardinal for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1948, Number 45
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 481, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast