Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Allison Hurley

Bishop Emeritus of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA

Apostolic Administrator of Gaylord, Michigan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1937 Born
5 Jun 196528.0Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
7 Jul 200366.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
7 Jul 200366.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Chunavia
12 Aug 200366.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chunavia
21 Jun 200568.0AppointedBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
4 Aug 200568.1InstalledBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
18 Apr 201375.8RetiredBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
17 Oct 201881.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Saginaw, Michigan, USA
26 Jul 201982.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of Saginaw, Michigan, USA
23 Jun 202083.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Gaylord, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Walter Allison Hurley
Bishop Walter Allison Hurley (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Grand Rapids

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFredericton, Canada
Ordained BishopMost Blessed Sacrament, Cathedral, Detroit, Archdiocese of Detroit, Michigan

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Grand Rapids.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,433
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Apr 2013
  • aadm: CB, 18 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast