Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adalberto Paulo da Silva, O.F.M. Cap.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Capsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1929 Born
8 Dec 195627.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
3 Apr 197546.1AppointedBishop of Viana, Maranhão, Brazil
3 Aug 197546.5Ordained BishopBishop of Viana, Maranhão, Brazil
24 May 199566.3ResignedBishop of Viana, Maranhão, Brazil
24 May 199566.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil
24 May 199566.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Capsa
24 Mar 200475.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Adalberto Paulo da Silva
Bishop Adalberto Paulo da Silva O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Fortaleza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSambaíba

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Fortaleza.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast