Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sťamus Cunningham

Bishop Emeritus of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1942 Born
12 Jun 196623.9Ordained PriestPriest of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
9 Jan 200966.5AppointedBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
20 Mar 200966.7Ordained BishopBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
4 Feb 201976.5RetiredBishop of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Sťamus Cunningham
Bishop Sťamus Cunningham (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Hexham and Newcastle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastlebar, County Mayo, Archdiocese of Tuam, Ireland
Ordained PriestSt. John's, College, Waterford, County Waterford, Diocese of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
Ordained BishopSaint Mary, Cathedral, Newcastle-upon-Tyne, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,070
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Feb 2019
  • c1: CL, 7 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast