Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Washington Cruz, C.P.

Archbishop of Goiânia, Goias, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1946 Born
25 Jul 197125.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
10 Feb 198740.7AppointedBishop of São Luís de Montes Belos, Goias, Brazil
9 May 198740.9Ordained BishopBishop of São Luís de Montes Belos, Goias, Brazil
8 May 200255.9AppointedArchbishop of Goiânia, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Washington Cruz
Archbishop Washington Cruz C.P. (born ) Archbishop of Goiânia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceItabuna
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bahia, Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Goiânia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 104, Number 9,029

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast