Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Renato Cardinal Corti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Novara, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1936Born
28 Jun 195923.3Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
30 Apr 198145.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
30 Apr 198145.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Zallata
6 Jun 198145.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zallata
19 Dec 199054.7AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
3 Mar 199155.0InstalledBishop of Novara, Italy
24 Nov 201175.7RetiredBishop of Novara, Italy
19 Nov 201680.7Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 201680.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
14 May 201781.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
12 May 202084.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Novara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Renato Corti (VIAF: 35531528)
Renato Cardinal Corti (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Novara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGalbiate, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained PriestDuomo, Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSt. Ambrose, Basilica, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Death PlaceCollegio dei Santi Ambrogio e Carlo, Rho, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Cathedral, Novara, Diocese of Novara

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 38.9 years
  • a cardinal for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • card: Bollettino, 9 Oct 2016
  • i: Bollettino, 8 May 2017
  • d: CB, 12 May 2020
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 68, Number 5,386
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Nov 2016
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 69, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 23 Nov 2020

Quantcast