Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Chu Ngọc Tri

Bishop of Lạng Sơn et Cao Bằng, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1956 Born
21 Nov 198933.1Ordained PriestPriest of Ð Nẵng, Viet Nam
13 May 200649.6AppointedBishop of Ð Nẵng, Viet Nam
4 Aug 200649.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ð Nẵng, Viet Nam
12 Mar 201659.5AppointedBishop of Lạng Sơn et Cao Bằng, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Chu Ngọc Tri
Bishop Joseph Chu Ngọc Tri (born ) Bishop of Lạng Sơn et Cao Bằng

EventPlace
Birth Place Nang

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lạng Sơn et Cao Bằng.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 May 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,216
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast