Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Marie Phạm Ngọc Chi

Deceased

Bishop of Ð Nẵng, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1909Born
23 Dec 193324.6Ordained PriestPriest
3 Feb 195040.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bi Chu, Viet Nam
3 Feb 195040.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sozopolis in Haemimonto
4 Aug 195041.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sozopolis in Haemimonto
5 Mar 196050.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of Bi Chu, Viet Nam
24 Nov 196051.5AppointedBishop of Quy Nhơn (Qui Nhơn), Viet Nam
18 Jan 196353.6AppointedBishop of Ð Nẵng, Viet Nam
21 Jan 198878.6DiedBishop of Ð Nẵng, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Pierre Marie Phạm Ngọc Chi
Bishop Pierre Marie Phạm Ngọc Chi (born , died ) Bishop of Ð Nẵng

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTn-Dao

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations piscopales, Year 1950, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast