Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franois Xavier Nguyễn Quang Sch

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ð Nẵng, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1925Born
9 Aug 195631.2Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jun 197550.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ð Nẵng, Viet Nam
6 Jun 197550.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Elephantaria in Proconsulari
6 Jun 197550.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elephantaria in Proconsulari
21 Jan 198862.6SucceededBishop of Ð Nẵng, Viet Nam
6 Nov 200075.4RetiredBishop of Ð Nẵng, Viet Nam
7 Jul 201388.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Ð Nẵng, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Franois Xavier Nguyễn Quang Sch
Bishop Franois Xavier Nguyễn Quang Sch (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ð Nẵng

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAn Ngai
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Cathedral, Ð Nẵng, Diocese of Ð Nẵng

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 8 Jul 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 41, Number 2,642

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast