Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Étienne Nguyễn Như Thể

Archbishop Emeritus of Huế, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1935 Born
6 Jan 196226.0Ordained PriestPriest of Huế, Viet Nam
7 Sep 197539.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Huế, Viet Nam
7 Sep 197539.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tipasa in Mauretania
7 Sep 197539.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tipasa in Mauretania
23 Nov 198347.9ResignedCoadjutor Archbishop of Huế, Viet Nam
1 Mar 199862.2AppointedArchbishop of Huế, Viet Nam
18 Aug 201276.7RetiredArchbishop of Huế, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Étienne Nguyễn Như Thể
Archbishop Étienne Nguyễn Như Thể (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Huế

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuang Tri
Ordained BishopHuế, Archdiocese of Huế

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Huế.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Aug 2012
  • fn: JI, 1 Apr 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 34, Number 2,076

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast