Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cosme Hoàng Văn Ðạt, S.J.

Bishop of Bắc Ninh, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1947 Born
16 Apr 196820.7ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
5 Jun 197628.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
4 Aug 200861.0AppointedBishop of Bắc Ninh, Viet Nam
7 Oct 200861.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bắc Ninh, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Cosme Hoàng Văn Ðạt
Bishop Cosme Hoàng Văn Ðạt S.J. (born ) Bishop of Bắc Ninh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceXuan Lai

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bắc Ninh.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Aug 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,977

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast