Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrice Alexandre Chiasson, C.I.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1867Born
4 Jun 189830.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
27 Jul 191749.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Golfe St-Laurent, Québec, Canada
27 Jul 191749.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Lydda
18 Oct 191749.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lydda
9 Sep 192052.7AppointedBishop of Chatham, New Brunswick, Canada
31 Jan 194274.1DiedBishop of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick

MicroData Summary for Patrice Alexandre Chiasson
Bishop Patrice Alexandre Chiasson C.I.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Bathurst in Canada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Joseph du Moine

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1917, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast