Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Bathurst in Canada

Dioecesis Bathurstensis in Canada



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Michel Proulx, O. Praem., Bishop-Elect

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 13 March 1938
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Moncton
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Province: New Brunswick
  • Country: Canada
  • Square Kilometers: 18,770 (7,249 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Atlantic (Atlantique)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: B
  • Official Web Site: http://diocesebathurst.com/
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, C.P. 460, 645 avenue Murray, Bathurst, NB E2A 3Z4, Canada
  • Telephone: (506)546-1420
  • Fax: 546-1423

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Chatham
8 May 1860ErectedDiocese of Saint John in New Brunswick Diocese of Chatham (erected)
22 February 1936Territory LostDiocese of Chatham (County of Kent)
Diocese of Saint John, New Brunswick (Counties of Westmorland, Albert, Kent, and some French parishes in the County of Northumberland)
Archdiocese of Moncton (erected)
22 February 1936Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Chatham (from Halifax to Moncton)
Diocese of Bathurst in Canada
13 March 1938Name ChangedDiocese of Chatham Diocese of Bathurst in Canada
13 May 1939Territory LostDiocese of Bathurst in Canada (Rogersville and Harwicke) Archdiocese of Moncton
16 December 1944Territory LostDiocese of Bathurst in Canada (Madawaska, Victoria, and Restigouche Sud) Diocese of Edmundston (erected)
9 February 1959Territory LostDiocese of Bathurst in Canada (Miramichi (Indian Mission of Burnt Church)) Diocese of Saint John, New Brunswick
24 January 1962Territory AddedDiocese of Saint John, New Brunswick (Parish of Beaver Brook) Diocese of Bathurst in Canada
11 November 2008Territory LostDiocese of Bathurst in Canada (Ascension (in Beaverbrook)) Diocese of Saint John, New Brunswick

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Bathurst in Canada
195086,055113,78875.6%103321356372842484ap1951
1959103,562134,00077.3%126351616434955668ap1960
196693,535112,00083.5%1053413967210152055ap1967
197096,436115,93683.2%94321267653244355ap1971
1976104,907119,09288.1%8511961,0923543055ap1977
1980111,700122,40091.3%84271111,0064533657ap1981
1990114,782124,78292.0%7017871,3192729962ap1991
1999112,130122,13091.8%5411651,7251724262ap2000
2000110,888120,88891.7%529611,81711423662ap2001
2001110,563120,56391.7%519601,84211421862ap2002
2002109,345119,34591.6%496551,98811021262ap2003
2003110,474120,47491.7%487552,00811220662ap2004
2004109,634119,63491.6%487551,99311319662ap2005
2006108,156118,15691.5%457522,0791318762ap2007
2012104,900115,30091.0%405452,331514757ap2013
201593,994103,99490.4%323352,685313556ap2016
201894,406102,40692.2%335382,484512356ap2019
202097,000105,00092.4%306362,6941611856ap2021
202289,06299,75189.3%243273,2981311056ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Chatham
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 178
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 28, Page 288, and Page 289
  • Diocese of Bathurst in Canada
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 30, Page 227, and Page 228
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 54, Page 185, and Page 186

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 8 Nov 2023