Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ricardo María Cardinal Carles Gordó

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Barcelona, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Consolatrice al Tiburtino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1926Born
29 Jun 195124.7Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia, Spain
6 Jun 196942.7AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
3 Aug 196942.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tortosa, Spain
23 Mar 199063.4AppointedArchbishop of Barcelona, Spain
26 Nov 199468.1Elevated to Cardinal
26 Nov 199468.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Consolatrice al Tiburtino
15 Jun 200477.7RetiredArchbishop of Barcelona, Spain
17 Dec 201387.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ricardo María Carles Gordó
Ricardo María Cardinal Carles Gordó (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Barcelona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tortosa, Diocese of Tortosa

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 44.3 years
  • a cardinal for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • d: CB, 17 Dec 2013
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Deceased Cardinals (back), Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 367

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Aug 2021

Quantcast