Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Esteban Escudero Torres

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Valencia, Spain

Titular Bishop of Diano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1946 Born
12 Jan 197528.9Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia, Spain
17 Nov 200054.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
17 Nov 200054.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thala
13 Jan 200154.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thala
9 Jul 201064.4AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
29 Aug 201064.5InstalledBishop of Palencia, Spain
7 May 201569.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
7 May 201569.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Diano
1 Mar 202175.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Esteban Escudero Torres (VIAF: 86723455)
Bishop Esteban Escudero Torres (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Valencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia
Ordained BishopCathedral, Valencia, Archdiocese of Valencia

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Valencia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,882
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 May 2015
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 1 Mar 2021

Quantcast