Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Juan Segura

Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain

Titular Bishop of Armentia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1955 Born
24 Oct 198126.4Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia, Spain
22 Jan 200549.6AppointedBishop of Ibiza, Spain
14 May 200549.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ibiza, Spain
18 Jan 202064.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
18 Jan 202064.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Armentia

MicroData Summary for Vicente Juan Segura
Bishop Vicente Juan Segura (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTabernes de Valldigna
Ordained BishopSanta Maria, Cathedral, Ibiza, Diocese of Ibiza

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Valencia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,887
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast