Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesc-Xavier Ciuraneta Aymí

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lleida, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1940Born
28 Jun 196424.2Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 199151.2AppointedBishop of Menorca, Spain
14 Sep 199151.5Ordained BishopBishop of Menorca, Spain
29 Oct 199959.6AppointedBishop of Lleida, Spain
8 Mar 200766.9ResignedBishop of Lleida, Spain
11 Nov 202080.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Lleida, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francesc-Xavier Ciuraneta Aymí
Bishop Francesc-Xavier Ciuraneta Aymí (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lleida

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Palma de Ebro
Ordained BishopCiutadella, Cathedral, Menorca, Diocese of Menorca
Death PlaceLa Palma de Ebro
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Lleida, Diocese of Lleida

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Mar 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,469
  • d: CB, 11 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast