Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Bressan

Archbishop Emeritus of Trento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1940 Born
28 Jun 196424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Trento, Italy
2 Mar 198343.0AppointedPermanent Observer to Council of Europe
3 Apr 198949.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Severiana
3 Apr 198949.1AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Pakistan
18 Jun 198949.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Severiana
26 Jul 199353.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Singapore
26 Jul 199353.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Thailand
26 Jul 199353.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Malaysia and Brunei
26 Jul 199353.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Laos
26 Jul 199353.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Myanmar
16 Jul 199454.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cambodia
2 Feb 199857.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Malaysia
2 Feb 199857.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Brunei Darussalam
25 Mar 199959.1AppointedArchbishop of Trento, Italy
30 May 199959.3InstalledArchbishop of Trento, Italy
10 Feb 201676.0RetiredArchbishop of Trento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Bressan (VIAF: 90162607)
Archbishop Luigi Bressan (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Trento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSarche, Archdiocese of Trento
Ordained PriestSan Vigilio, Cathedral, Trento, Archdiocese of Trento
Ordained BishopSan Vigilio, Cathedral, Trento, Archdiocese of Trento

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Trento.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,351
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2016
  • c1/loc: AM, 1 Aug 2018
  • xx05: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 75, Page 343

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 20 Nov 2020

Quantcast