Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bertrand Blanchet

Archbishop Emeritus of Rimouski, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1932 Born
20 May 195623.6Ordained PriestPriest of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada
21 Oct 197341.0AppointedBishop of Gaspé, Québec, Canada
8 Dec 197341.2Ordained BishopBishop of Gaspé, Québec, Canada
16 Oct 199260.0AppointedArchbishop of Rimouski, Québec, Canada
2 Feb 199360.3InstalledArchbishop of Rimouski, Québec, Canada
3 Jul 200875.7RetiredArchbishop of Rimouski, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Bertrand Blanchet (VIAF: 65366741)
Archbishop Bertrand Blanchet (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Rimouski

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt-Thomas-de-Montmagny
Ordained PriestChurch, St-Thomas-de-Montmagny
Ordained BishopChrist the King, Cathedral, Gaspé, Diocese of Gaspé, Québec

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Rimouski.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2008
  • c1/loc: CB, 14 Apr 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 22, Number 1,237

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast