Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Miabesue Bibi

Bishop of Buéa, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1971 Born
26 Apr 200028.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bamenda, Cameroon
24 Jan 201745.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamenda, Cameroon
24 Jan 201745.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Amudarsa
25 Mar 201745.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amudarsa
28 Dec 201948.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Buéa, Cameroon
5 Jan 202149.4AppointedBishop of Buéa, Cameroon
25 Feb 202149.5InstalledBishop of Buéa, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Michael Miabesue Bibi
Bishop Michael Miabesue Bibi (born ) Bishop of Buéa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBamessing, Diocese of Bamenda
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Cathedral, Bamenda, Archdiocese of Bamenda

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Buéa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Jan 2017
  • ob: CB, 22 Feb 2017
  • obp: CB, 27 Mar 2017
  • c2+: CB, 30 Mar 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,359
  • ab: CB, 28 Dec 2019
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2021
  • i: AM, 26 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Mar 2021

Quantcast