Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Sankt Pölten

Dioecesis Sancti Hippolyti



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Alois Schwarz, Bishop
  • Anton Leichtfried, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Klaus Küng, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 28 January 1785
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}
  • Depends on: Dicastery for Bishops
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Austria
  • Square Kilometers: 10,450 (4,036 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.dsp.at/
  • Mailing Address: Bischofliches Ordinariat, Domplatz 1, A-3100 Sankt Polten, Oesterreich
  • Telephone: (02742)324

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
28 January 1785ErectedDiocese of Passau Diocese of Linz (erected)
Diocese of Sankt Pölten (erected)
2 September 1937Territory LostDiocese of Sankt Pölten (Vitoraz) Diocese of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}
14 November 2014Territory LostDiocese of Sankt Pölten (Portions of Hochstraß and Schwabendörfl in Altlengbach) Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950345,019363,54294.9%4252947194793421,358410ap1951
1970630,334656,52596.0%5461466929101461,250420ap1971
1980640,742672,00095.3%40828969791910314674423ap1981
1990585,775630,71792.9%35124359498626270454424ap1991
1999577,471633,10691.2%3111824931,17143221313424ap2000
2000572,109628,67191.0%3201825021,13945217314424ap2001
2001575,146624,16192.1%3122105221,10148248286424ap2002
2002573,584630,00091.0%3042245281,08651265303414ap2003
2003570,186623,97591.4%2762245001,14051284287423ap2004
2004566,679629,92890.0%3072115181,09348282251424ap2005
2010540,954613,20088.2%2951984931,09778247192424ap2011
2014516,765621,10083.2%2762224981,03788269158423ap2015
2017501,221629,00079.7%2742214951,01288265135422ap2018
2020482,587637,39075.7%2881604481,07795215117422ap2021
2022484,700640,20075.7%2681414091,18593190102422ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 302

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024