Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Friedrich Gustav Cardinal Piffl, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco

Apostolic Administrator of Burgenland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1864Born
1883²18.2EnteredMember of Confederation of Canons Regular of St. Augustine
8 Jan 188823.2Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Canons Regular of St. Augustine
1 Apr 191348.4SelectedArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
2 May 191348.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
1 Jun 191348.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
8 Jun 191348.6InstalledArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
25 May 191449.6Elevated to Cardinal
8 Sep 191449.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
18 May 192257.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Burgenland, Austria
21 Apr 193267.5DiedArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Friedrich Gustav Piffl (VIAF: 10643089)
Friedrich Gustav Cardinal Piffl C.R.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Wien {Vienna}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLanškroun, Diocese of Hradec Králové, Czechia
Ordained PriestSankt Stefan, Cathedral, Wien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}
Ordained BishopKlosterneuburg, Abbey, Klosterneuburg
Death PlaceWien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, near Kranichberg, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}
Buried Place (Current)Bishops' Crypt, Sankt Stefan, Cathedral, Wien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
  • a cardinal for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1913, Number 29
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 272, Ascendance
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 25 May 1914
  • b: CB, 5 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 Apr 2021

Quantcast