Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Donato Squicciarini

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Austria

Titular Archbishop of Tiburnia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1927Born
12 Apr 195224.9Ordained PriestPriest
31 Aug 197851.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tiburnia
31 Aug 197851.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Burundi
26 Nov 197851.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tiburnia
16 Sep 198154.3AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Gabon
16 Sep 198154.3AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Cameroun
16 Sep 198154.3AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Equatorial Guinea
1 Jul 198962.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
8 Oct 200275.4RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Austria
5 Mar 200678.8DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Austria

MicroData Summary for Donato Squicciarini (VIAF: 23058364)
Archbishop Donato Squicciarini (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Austria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAltamura, Territorial Prelature of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Altamura, Territorial Prelature of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 50, Number 3,454

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 26 Dec 2020

Quantcast