Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Bergamaschi, S.D.B.

Vicar Apostolic of Gambella, Ethiopia

Titular Bishop of Ambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1954 Born
8 Sep 197520.7ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
13 Sep 198126.7Perpetual VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
2 Oct 198227.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
29 Jun 201661.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Awasa, Ethiopia
29 Jun 201661.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ambia
8 Oct 201661.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ambia
29 Sep 202065.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Gambella, Ethiopia
31 Oct 202065.8InstalledVicar Apostolic of Gambella, Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Roberto Bergamaschi
Bishop Roberto Bergamaschi S.D.B. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Gambella

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Donato Milanese, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained PriestSan Paolo, Church, Brescia, Diocese of Brescia, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Awasa, Vicariate Apostolic of Awasa

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Gambella.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2016
  • ob: CB, 3 Aug 2016
  • c23: CB, 8 Oct 2016
  • c34: CB, 9 Oct 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,206
  • bpd: AM, 8 Jul 2019
  • loc: AM, 25 May 2020
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Sep 2020
  • i: AM, 19 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 20 Nov 2020

Quantcast