Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anuar Battisti

Archbishop Emeritus of Maringá, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1953 Born
8 Dec 198027.8Ordained PriestPriest of Toledo, Parana, Brazil
15 Apr 199845.1AppointedBishop of Toledo, Parana, Brazil
20 Jun 199845.3Ordained BishopBishop of Toledo, Parana, Brazil
29 Sep 200451.6AppointedArchbishop of Maringá, Parana, Brazil
24 Nov 200451.7InstalledArchbishop of Maringá, Parana, Brazil
20 Nov 201966.7ResignedArchbishop of Maringá, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Anuar Battisti
Archbishop Anuar Battisti (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Maringá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLajeado
Ordained BishopEstádio municipal 14 de Dezembro, Toledo, Diocese of Toledo, Parana

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Maringá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,341
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Nov 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast