Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Owando

Archidioecesis Ouandoensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Victor Abagna Mossa, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 30 May 2020
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Congo
  • Square Kilometers: 75,450 (29,142 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Évêché, B.P. 06, Owando, Rep. du Congo
  • Telephone: 06.857.27.04

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Fort-Rousset
21 December 1950ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Brazzaville Vicariate Apostolic of Fort-Rousset (erected)
Diocese of Fort-Rousset
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Fort-Rousset Diocese of Fort-Rousset
Diocese of Owando
3 December 1977Name ChangedDiocese of Fort-Rousset Diocese of Owando
6 June 1983Territory LostDiocese of Owando Diocese of Ouesso (erected)
22 February 2013Territory LostDiocese of Owando Diocese of Gamboma (erected)
Archdiocese of Owando
30 May 2020ElevatedDiocese of Owando Archdiocese of Owando

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Fort-Rousset
197071,764290,27824.7%1021312,3142518ap1971
Diocese of Owando
198077,067271,00028.4%917262,964223814ap1981
198771,457246,12729.0%149233,106113214ap1991
1999230,700525,00043.9%197268,873204023ap2000
2000250,600525,00047.7%219308,353243824ap2001
2001135,000243,94655.3%429512,647193719ap2002
2002250,600525,00047.7%239327,831163824ap2003
2003320,750525,00061.1%269359,164164424ap2004
2004250,756525,00047.8%326386,5981133624ap2005
2013290,000400,00072.5%325377,8371122415ap2014
2016312,908429,86472.8%404447,111172023ap2017
Archdiocese of Owando

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_d, v3.3.4, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 30 May 2020

Quantcast