Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ricardo Lingan Baccay

Archbishop of Tuguegarao, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1961 Born
10 Apr 198726.0Ordained PriestPriest of Tuguegarao, Philippines
23 Feb 200745.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tuguegarao, Philippines
23 Feb 200745.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Gabala
10 Apr 200746.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gabala
20 Feb 201654.8AppointedBishop of Alaminos, Philippines
4 May 201655.0InstalledBishop of Alaminos, Philippines
18 Oct 201958.5AppointedArchbishop of Tuguegarao, Philippines
14 Jan 202058.7InstalledArchbishop of Tuguegarao, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Ricardo Lingan Baccay
Archbishop Ricardo Lingan Baccay (born ) Archbishop of Tuguegarao

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTuguegarao, Archdiocese of Tuguegarao
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tuguegarao, Archdiocese of Tuguegarao

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Tuguegarao.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Feb 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,402
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Feb 2016
  • i: CB, 4 May 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Oct 2019
  • i: AM, 26 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast