Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Cornelius van Sambeek, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kigoma

Titular Bishop of Tracula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1886BornVoldhoven lez Eindhoven, Netherlands
29 Jun 191125.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
19 Nov 193650.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tanganika, Tanzania
19 Nov 193650.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Gergis
7 Mar 193750.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gergis
10 May 194660.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kigoma, Tanzania
25 Mar 195366.9AppointedBishop of Kigoma, Tanzania
22 Nov 195771.5ResignedBishop of Kigoma, Tanzania
22 Nov 195771.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tracula
25 Dec 196680.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Kigoma, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Jan Cornelius van Sambeek:
Bishop Jan Cornelius van Sambeek M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kigoma

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015