Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karol Salbeck

Deceased

Bishop of Spiš, Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1723Born
5 Mar 174622.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Oct 174622.9Ordained PriestPriest
4 Apr 175935.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vác, Hungary
4 Apr 175935.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Nemesi
15 Jan 177652.1SelectedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
16 Sep 177652.8ConfirmedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
11 Nov 177652.9InstalledBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
15 Jun 178561.5DiedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Karol Salbeck
Bishop Karol Salbeck (born , died ) Bishop of Spiš

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGalati, Romania

  • a priest for 38.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 305, and Page 369
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 453
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast